SHEKINAH PRAISE MISSION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Organises Sunday services to preach and teach the word of God as reported in the Bible; visits the sick and the elderly in the local community to provide essential support services; organises community out-reach services to evoke the intervention of the Holy Spirit into the lives of residents; Organises emergency aid to relief the suffering of communties that face distress from natural disaster.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Haringey
Governance
- 08 August 2013: CIO registration
- SPM (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anoria SIMMONS | Trustee | 21 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
EVERETT FRANCIS | Trustee | 06 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH MITCHELL | Trustee | 06 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW SIMMONS MBA | Trustee | 06 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
MONICA ANDERSON | Trustee | 06 June 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £40.72k | £22.00k | £15.29k | £6.84k | £7.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.00k | £30.60k | £11.48k | £5.58k | £4.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 11 July 2024 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 11 July 2024 | 11 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 25 July 2023 | 25 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 25 July 2023 | 25 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 29 September 2022 | 91 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 29 September 2022 | 91 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 21 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 21 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 19 August 2020 | 50 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 12 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 08 Aug 2013
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTAIN RELIGION FOR PUBLIC BENEFIT IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DEEM FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
98 FOREST ROAD
EDMONTON
LONDON
N9 8RX
- Phone:
- 02088050967
- Email:
- kingshill.reserve@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window