THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. MARY'S ASH VALE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular public worship for all Provision of sacred space for prayer and contemplation Pastoral work including visiting the sick and bereaved Teaching of Christianity via sermons and groups Religious assemblies in schools Provision of youth club with a Christian ethos Supporting other charities Provision of activities with a Christian ethos for the elderly, youth and parents and toddlers
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £28,044 from 6 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hampshire
- Surrey
Governance
- 04 July 2013: Previously excepted registration
- ST MARY'S PCC ASH VALE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV NEIL LAMBERT | Chair | 02 July 2013 |
|
|||||
Patricia Martin | Trustee | 13 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Janet Lusty | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Retallick | Trustee | 04 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Peter George Scott | Trustee | 04 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jane Cox | Trustee | 04 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Cheryl Winston Glover | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Charles Lusty | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Martin Lindsay | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
PATRICK ALAN BROWN | Trustee | 02 July 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £144.42k | £148.26k | £132.40k | £144.55k | £182.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £148.80k | £142.51k | £145.01k | £161.32k | £167.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £17.74k | £7.40k | N/A | £28.04k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 22 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 12 November 2023 | 12 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 18 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 November 2021 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 02 November 2021 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
153 Vale Road
Ash Vale
ALDERSHOT
GU12 5HX
- Phone:
- 01276 502280
- Email:
- parishoffice@ash-vale.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window