THE MANCHESTER DISTRICT ASSOCIATION OF UNITARIAN AND FREE CHRISTIAN CHURCHES

Charity number: 503753
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The income and capital from this fund is to be applied to the upkeep, repair and improvement of churches whose congregations are members of the Association and to the maintenance of services and otherwise furthering the religious, educational and charitable work of the Association.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £42,978
Total expenditure: £119,876

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Cheshire East
  • Cheshire West & Chester
  • Lancashire
  • Manchester City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 25 November 1974: Standard registration
  • 04 February 1994: Removed
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • MDA (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Vincent Gerard McCully Trustee 08 June 2021
RIVINGTON AND BLACKROD GRAMMAR SCHOOL AND PRIZE FUNDS
Received: On time
RIVINGTON PRESBYTERIAN CHAPEL (TRUST PROPERTY HELD IN CONNECTION WITH)
Received: On time
MANCHESTER UNITARIAN CONGREGATIONAL FUND
Received: On time
laura Dobson Trustee 08 June 2021
None on record
Rev DANIEL CROSBY Trustee 09 June 2020
None on record
MARK DOUGLAS PEARCE Trustee 09 June 2020
THE HIBBERT TRUST
Received: On time
THE JOHN GREGSON TRUST
Received: On time
Jeffery Lane Gould Reverend Trustee 04 June 2019
None on record
Geoffery John Levermore Professor Trustee 04 June 2019
None on record
Christopher Cody Coyne Reverend Trustee 04 June 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £785.69k £46.06k £14.73k £43.42k £42.98k
Total expenditure £235.20k £236.52k £42.02k £109.67k £119.88k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £49.21k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £736.48k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £235.20k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £30.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £205.21k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 04 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 04 July 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 18 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 18 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 08 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 24 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 24 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 01 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 01 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF 5TH SEPTEMBER 1974
Charitable objects
IN OF TOWARDS THE UPKEEP REPAIR AND IMPROVEMENT OF CHAPELS WHOSE CONGREGATIONS ARE MEMBERS OF THE MANCHESTER DISTRICT ASSOCIATION OF UNITARIAN AND FREE CHRISTIAN CHURCHES AND IN OF TOWARDS THE MAINTENANCE OF THE SERVICES IN THE SAID CHAPELS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 25 November 1974 : Standard registration
  • 04 February 1994 : Removed

Contact information

Address:
Cross Street Chapel
29 Cross Street
MANCHESTER
M2 1NL
Phone:
07401872137