Financial history MERTON CENTRE FOR INDEPENDENT LIVING

Charity number: 1152825
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £364.14k £372.82k £343.81k £334.77k £468.01k
Total expenditure £348.91k £353.24k £361.90k £327.29k £315.54k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £13.33k N/A N/A N/A £86.62k