Better Planet Education

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Better Planet Education is a charity that aims to create a better future by inspiring young people to look after our world. We provide free environmental information and education services to schools and young people. These include our website, free online presentations, free-to-download lesson plans, home learning packs and Better Planet Schools, our online education programme for schools.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
13 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- YOUNG PEOPLE'S TRUST FOR THE ENVIRONMENT (Previous name)
- YPTE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Brian James Green | Chair | 30 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Amy Rong Jiang | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ivan Andrew Teage | Trustee | 29 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lorna Anne Mein | Trustee | 07 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan James Bennett | Trustee | 12 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gabriela Aurelia Lozano Licona | Trustee | 30 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kate Lumsden | Trustee | 02 May 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £411.81k | £441.70k | £424.25k | £476.35k | £476.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £355.77k | £431.02k | £424.16k | £442.58k | £460.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £22.50k | £17.50k | £20.20k | £10.00k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £15.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 21 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 06 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 16 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 09 Sep 2013 as amended on 05 Aug 2024
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, WITH A FOCUS ON CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING VARIOUS EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES, EDUCATIONAL PROGRAMMES AND EDUCATIONAL RESOURCES RELATING TO THE STUDY OF THE NATURAL ENVIRONMENT AND THE POSITIVE ROLE THAT CONSERVATION AND PRESERVATION CAN PLAY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Yeovil Innovation Centre
Copse Road
Lufton Trading Estate
Lufton
Yeovil
BA22 8RN
- Phone:
- 01935315025
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window