E:MERGE (UK) LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A charity with a Christian ethos undertaking youth work for over 20 years in the most segregated, deprived and broken wards in Bradford and in other parts of the UK. Our goal is to operate to reach the most marginalized and enable them to become part of a community within which they can thrive, develop and realise their potential. We work with young people, at home, in school and on the streets.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £61,339 from 6 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bradford City
- Calderdale
- Kirklees
- Leeds City
Governance
- E:merge (UK) Company Limited (Working name)
- E:MERGE (BRADFORD) COMPANY LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Howard Keith Astin | Chair | 17 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
Imaan Labad | Trustee | 19 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Derek Alan Jones | Trustee | 27 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Paul Harold Massey | Trustee | 23 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Joel Topham | Trustee | 28 March 2014 |
|
|||||
Sharon Elizabeth de Villiers | Trustee | 17 May 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £374.50k | £393.82k | £340.21k | £395.98k | £400.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £353.14k | £364.58k | £375.01k | £410.45k | £487.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £12.27k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £6.31k | £154.39k | £32.61k | £53.61k | £61.34k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 11 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 13 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 03 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 03 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 25/11/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 24/04/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24/11/2014 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 03/12/2014
Charitable objects
TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE LIVING IN BRADFORD AND THE UK BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE AND ORGANISING PROGRAMMES AND COMMUNITY FACILITIES, WITHIN A CHRISTIAN ETHOS, TO: (A) ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; (B) ADVANCE EDUCATION; (C) RELIEVE UNEMPLOYMENT; (D) PROVIDE RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITY IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR PEOPLE LIVING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO HAVE NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS.’
Area of benefit
BRADFORD AND THE UK
Contact information
- Address:
-
e-merge (UK)
51 Kyffin Place
Sutton Community Centre
Bradford
BD4 8NB
- Phone:
- 01274660244
- Email:
- finance@emergeonline.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window