West Derby Neighbourhood Church

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Children?s work, Youth work, Special events, visitation, mission work, Coffee morning, various courses, food bank collection, clothing collection for the homeless, community projects. In addition to these activities the Church held regular weekly services which are open to all. Links have been maintained with other local churches and joint ventures undertaken with them.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Liverpool City
Governance
- 08 May 2013: Standard registration
- WEST DERBY EVANGELICAL CHURCH (Working name)
- West Derby Neighbourhood Church (Working name)
- WEST DERBY EVANGELICAL CHURCH (LIVERPOOL) (Previous name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
FRANK DRIESSEN | Chair | 07 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
Judith Daley | Trustee | 19 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Brian Briggs | Trustee | 20 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robert John Jones | Trustee | 20 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Colin John Gregg | Trustee | 23 May 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £53.77k | £49.50k | £51.15k | £50.90k | £50.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £40.10k | £32.90k | £29.58k | £41.91k | £41.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 06 February 2025 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 06 February 2025 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 01 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 01 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 05 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 05 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 27 March 2021 | 50 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 27 March 2021 | 50 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 15 MAR 2013 as amended on 06 Nov 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE TRUST FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT ARE TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO IN LIVERPOOL AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND TO FULFIL SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE TRUST
Contact information
- Address:
-
25 ST. JAMES CLOSE
LIVERPOOL
L12 7JU
- Phone:
- 01512288757
- Email:
- hello@wdnc.church
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window