SLOUGH FURNITURE PROJECT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
An Anti poverty charity helping people in financial hardship living on state benefits on low income to furnish their homes with good quality safety compliant reused items at low cost we also offer clothing, toys, crockery. To help underprivileged disabled and people over 65 with tasks in their homes that they can no longer manage safely. To encourage unemployed people to volunteer .
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Buckinghamshire
- Slough
- Windsor And Maidenhead
Governance
- 16 May 2013: Standard registration
- 02 March 2022: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £70.95k | £71.99k | £70.15k | £68.23k | £73.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £82.37k | £66.06k | £65.96k | £63.33k | £80.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 17 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 17 January 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 28 January 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | 28 January 2019 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 05 MAR 2013
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS BY COLLECTION, RENOVATION AND DISTRIBUTION OF FURNITURE AND OTHER HOUSEHOLD ITEMS OR ACCESSORIES CALCULATED TO REDUCE THE NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OF SUCH PERSONS UNABLE TO ACQUIRE SUCH ITEMS FROM THEIR OWN RESOURCES, WHO RESIDE IN SLOUGH AND SURROUNDING AREAS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window