Accounts and annual returns THE BISCUIT FUND

Charity Number: 1154117
Charity reporting is up to date (5 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 05 November 2024 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 05 November 2024 5 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 25 November 2022 25 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 25 November 2022 25 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 01 November 2021 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 01 November 2021 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 10 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 10 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window