Financial history THE AFRICAN MORINGA AND PERMACULTURE PROJECT (AMPP)

Charity Number: 1153259
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023
Total gross income £716 £279 £32 £0 £0
Total expenditure £386 £1.18k £585 £157 £418
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A