POLESWORTH (ABBEY) SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO PROMOTE THE DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN ACHIEVING THEIR FULL PHYSICAL, INTELLECTUAL, SOCIAL AND SPIRITUAL POTENTIALS AS INDIVIDUALS, AS RESPONSIBLE CITIZENS AND AS MEMBERS OF THEIR LOCAL, NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITIES THROUGH SCOUTING
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 July 2024
Total income includes £350 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
16 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Derbyshire
- Leicestershire
- Staffordshire
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 08 May 2013: Standard registration
- POLESWORTH SCOUT GROUP (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sohpie Smith | Trustee | 12 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Carys Loveland | Trustee | 27 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Brianne Asbury | Trustee | 27 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Martin Etheridge | Trustee | 27 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sam Dodds | Trustee | 27 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
TRACEY ELIZABETH LOVELAND | Trustee | 03 May 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/07/2020 | 01/07/2021 | 01/07/2022 | 01/07/2023 | 01/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.96k | £14.69k | £28.75k | £31.97k | £29.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.77k | £15.16k | £21.38k | £42.30k | £36.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | £350 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 July 2024 | 17 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 July 2024 | 17 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 July 2023 | 22 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 July 2023 | 22 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 July 2022 | 15 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 July 2022 | 15 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 July 2021 | 21 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 July 2020 | 23 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 July 2020 | 23 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 04/01/1912
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN ACHIEVING THEIR FULL PHYSICAL, INTELLECTUAL, SOCIAL AND SPIRITUAL POTENTIALS AS INDIVIDUALS, AS RESPONSIBLE CITIZENS AND AS MEMBERS OF THEIR LOCAL, NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITIES
Contact information
- Address:
-
32 Whateley Lane
Whateley
Tamworth
B78 2ET
- Phone:
- 07815 316862
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window