Financial history CHRIST THE LIVING WORD CHURCH

Charity number: 1154838
Charity reporting is up to date (4 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £30.57k £20.52k £13.08k £11.39k £33.89k
Total expenditure £18.25k £8.86k £7.52k £7.69k £24.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A