Financial history FRIENDS OF BARNFIELD ESTATE LTD

Charity number: 1155248
Charity reporting is overdue by 71 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2019 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023
Total gross income £10.95k £13.45k £43.06k £33.98k £41.68k
Total expenditure £38.10k £27.00k £41.51k £46.31k £53.57k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £29.59k £8.16k £9.00k