Accounts and annual returns WISHABLE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1153120
Charity reporting is overdue by 1015 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 October 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 284 days
Accounts and TAR 01 October 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 284 days
Annual return 01 October 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 650 days
Accounts and TAR 01 October 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 650 days
Annual return 01 October 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1015 days
Accounts and TAR 01 October 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1015 days
Annual return 01 October 2020 02 September 2021 32 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 01 October 2019 02 September 2021 397 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 October 2019 Not Required