THE TOGETHER PLAN LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Together Plan is a UK based charity that works with communities in Eastern Europe and the Former Soviet Union to support community capacity building. Empowering communities and their members so that they are better equipped to help develop from within. Currently The Together Plan is focusing on working with communities in Belarus.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
Total income includes £8,556 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
82 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
- Belarus
- Poland
- Ukraine
Governance
- 10 October 2013: Standard registration
- TTP LTD (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Karina Kizhner | Trustee | 27 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Russell David Eisen | Trustee | 28 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrea Mihaleto | Trustee | 20 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jack Nathan Baum | Trustee | 04 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gelena Rozenberg | Trustee | 21 April 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £243.24k | £238.04k | £200.28k | £200.00k | £221.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £214.39k | £229.62k | £220.35k | £196.92k | £208.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £6.41k | £8.56k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 24 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 24 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 11 January 2024 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 11 January 2024 | 14 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 06 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 06 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 22 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 22 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 22 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 22 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 12 FEB 2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 27 AUG 2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 25 SEP 2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24 JUN 2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09 JAN 2019 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09 MAY 2022 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05 JUL 2022 as amended on 15 Feb 2023 as amended on 07 Nov 2024 as amended on 21 Mar 2025
Charitable objects
The charity’s objects (‘Objects’) are specifically restricted to the following: To promote community capacity building, for the benefit of the public, in order to develop the capacity and skills of the members of socially and economically disadvantaged communities primarily, but not exclusively, in the Former Soviet Union and Eastern Europe, in such a way that they are better able to identify and help meet their needs and to participate more fully in society by means as the directors deem fit. In each case, this includes training, youth and education to include collaborative cross-border education programming. Nothing in these articles shall authorise an application of the property of the charity for purposes which are not charitable in accordance with any statutory provision regarding the meaning of the word "charitable" or the words "charitable purposes" in force in any part of the United Kingdom.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Studio
60 Glencoe Road
Bushey
WD23 3DS
- Phone:
- 02033750656
- Email:
- contact@thetogetherplan.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window