Accounts and annual returns FLOURISH FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1154196
Charity reporting is overdue by 972 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 241 days
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 241 days
Annual return 31 October 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 607 days
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 607 days
Annual return 31 October 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 972 days
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 972 days
Annual return 31 October 2020 30 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2019 30 August 2021 364 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 Not Required