AMAZING GRACE CHINESE CHRISTIAN CHURCH IN READING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WORSHIP SERVICES, BIBLE STUDIES, PRAYER MEETINGS, FELLOWSHIP MEETINGS, VISITATIONS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Bath And North East Somerset
- Bracknell Forest
- Reading
- West Berkshire
- Wokingham
Governance
- 30 September 2013: Standard registration
- AGCCCIR (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ZHIPING CHEN | Chair | 30 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
Chan Pong Sin | Trustee | 07 December 2020 |
|
|||||
Rev Chok Keung Stewart So | Trustee | 19 February 2017 |
|
|||||
James King Hang So | Trustee | 19 February 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.72k | £38.55k | £40.22k | £49.69k | £71.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £31.01k | £34.12k | £38.78k | £48.77k | £62.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.21k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 04 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 05 MAY 2013 AS AMENDED ON 28/07/2013 AS AMENDED ON 01/09/2013
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS, LISTED UNDER ARTICLE 3 OF THE CONSTITUTION, IN SUCH WAYS AS THE DEACONS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
88 FROGMORE ROAD
BLACKWATER
CAMBERLEY
SURREY
GU17 0DF
- Phone:
- 07765880444
- Email:
- pastor.agcccir@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window