THE C M LOWE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the charity are to pay or to apply the income from the trust for the benefit which are exclusively charitiable under the laws of England and Wales as the Trustees shall at their absolute discretion determine.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 15 July 2013: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.41k | £19.82k | £17.55k | £24.04k | £32.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £48.83k | £32.62k | £44.92k | £18.91k | £53.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 03 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 02 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 02 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL PROVED ON 28/05/2013
Charitable objects
THE COMPANY SHALL HOLD MY RESIDUARY ESTATE AS TO BOTH CAPITAL AND INCOME UPON TRUST TO BE KNOWN AS "THE C M LOWE CHARITABLE TRUST" (THE "TRUST FUND") ON THE FOLLOWING TRUSTS AND SUBJECT TO THE FOLLOWING POWERS AND PROVISIONS:- (A) TO APPLY THE INCOME THEREOF FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH CHARITIES WHICH BENEFIT THOSE SUFFERING FROM ARTHRITIS ALZHEIMERS DISEASE AND BLINDNESS AS THE COMPANY SHALL IN ITS ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SELECT AND IN SUCH MANNER AND IN SUCH SHARES AS THE COMPANY SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT AND PROVIDED THAT UNTIL THE EXPIRATION OF THE PERIOD OF TWENTY ONE YEARS FROM MY DEATH MY TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE THE POWER TO ACCUMULATE THE WHOLE OR ANY PART OF SUCH INCOME BY INVESTING THE SAME IN ANY INVESTMENTS HEREBY AUTHORISED AND ALL ACCUMULATIONS MADE SHALL FORM AN ACCRETION TO THE CAPITAL OF THE TRUST FUND; (B) NOTWITHSTANDING THE FOREGOING TRUST OF INCOME THE COMPANY SHALL HAVE POWER AT ANY TIME OR TIMES TO PAY TRANSFER OR APPLY THE WHOLE OR ANY PART OF THE CAPITAL OF THE TRUST FUND TO OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH CHARITY OR CHARITIES AS HEREINBEFORE MENTIONED IN SUCH SHARES AND IN SUCH MANNER AS THE COMPANY SHALL IN ITS ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
THROUGHOUT ENGLAND AND WALES
Contact information
- Address:
-
HSBC Trust Company (UK) Limited
Forum 1
2nd Floor
The Forum
Parkway
Whiteley
- Phone:
- 02380 72 2237
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window