Accounts and annual returns FAIRFIELD ENVIRONMENT TRUST

Charity Number: 1153131
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 13 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2023 28 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 28 February 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2022 28 July 2023 119 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 28 July 2023 119 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2021 26 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 26 February 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2020 29 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 29 March 2021 On Time Download Open in new window