PUDSEY WELLBEING CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of facilities for recreation or other leisure time occupation of individuals who have need of such facilities. Provision of health related activities and interventions, principally through the delivery of a community volunteer programme.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £4,118 from 3 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Leeds City
Governance
- 09 August 2013: CIO registration
- PUDSEY WELLBEING CENTRE (Working name)
- LOVE PUDSEY (Previous name)
- ROBIN LANE HEALTH AND WELLBEING CHARITY (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ian Cocking | Trustee | 07 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dennis Gibbons | Trustee | 30 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Philip Goodfellow | Trustee | 30 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Stuart Middleton | Trustee | 06 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anita Kaur Panesar | Trustee | 14 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jill Huggins | Trustee | 15 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Trish Smith | Trustee | 21 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Eleanor Scougall | Trustee | 09 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA TRENAMAN | Trustee | 25 July 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £105.90k | £102.50k | £92.18k | £48.48k | £81.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £103.72k | £71.98k | £95.09k | £74.29k | £64.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £4.56k | £51.75k | £14.35k | £4.50k | £4.12k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 10 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 11 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 07 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED 09 AUG 2013 AMENDED ON 18 JUL 2017 as amended on 14 Feb 2019
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE HEALTH IN PUDSEY, BOTH PHYSICAL AND MENTAL, BY PROVIDING A RANGE OF HEALTH RELATED ACTIVITIES AND INTERVENTIONS TO ENABLE PEOPLE TO LIVE LONGER AND HEALTHIER LIVES THAT ARE FULL AND MEANINGFUL 2) TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF PUDSEY AND THE SURROUNDING AREA THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
23
Robin Lane
Pudsey
LS28 7BR
- Phone:
- 07856532199
- Email:
- hello@pudseywellbeing.com
- Website:
-
pudseywellbeing.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window