Accounts and annual returns APOSTOLIC PILLAR OF FAITH MINISTRIES

Charity number: 1153798
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 04 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 04 February 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2023 07 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 23 June 2024 54 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 06 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 06 March 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 26 May 2022 26 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 26 May 2022 26 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 24 May 2021 24 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 24 May 2021 24 days late Download Open in new window