Financial history EASTBOURNE ISLAMIC CULTURAL CENTRE

Charity Number: 1152022
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/05/2020 30/05/2021 30/05/2022 30/05/2023 30/05/2024
Total gross income £75.60k £104.51k £88.96k £107.49k £89.40k
Total expenditure £89.47k £74.07k £76.03k £90.08k £88.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £32.98k N/A N/A N/A