ASTON AND WEYMOUTH VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Aston Village Hall is the only community meeting place servicing the villages of Aston, Willoughbridge and Weymouth. It provides a venue for meetings, fitness activities, church services and community events. The trustees hold a number of social events and activities every year.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Shropshire
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 21 November 1974: Standard registration
- ASTON VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Guy Anthony Chatburn | Chair | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Michele Lesley Ibbs | Trustee | 01 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael Norman Kelly | Trustee | 01 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen David Wedgwood | Trustee | 01 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Miles Scott | Trustee | 04 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rosalind Anne Chatburn | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Helen Inskip | Trustee | 18 May 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.04k | £23.22k | £5.51k | £7.48k | £4.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.95k | £3.23k | £8.04k | £16.89k | £8.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £21.05k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 March 2024 | 56 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 17 DECEMBER 1953
Charitable objects
FOR THE PURPOSES OF PHYSICAL AND MENTAL TRAINING AND RECREATION ANDSOCIAL MORAL AND INTELLECTUAL DEVELOPMENT THROUGH THE MEDUIM OF READING AND RECREATION ROOMS LIBRARY LECTURES CLASSES RECREATIONS AND ENTERTAINMENTS OF OTHERWISE AS MAY BE FOUND EXPEDIENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANS OF THE CIVIL PARISH OF MAER AND THEIR IMMEDIATE VICINITY. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 2 OF TRUST DEED)
Area of benefit
ASTON AND WEYMOUTH IN THE CIVIL PARISH OF MAER.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ASTON BY PIPEGATE
MARKET DRAYTON
SHROPSHIRE
TF9 4JD
- Phone:
- 07809875784
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window