Accounts and annual returns LOOE MUSIC FESTIVAL

Charity number: 1152285
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 30 November 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 30 November 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 30 November 2016 12 January 2018 104 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

11 January 2018 103 days late