LOOE MUSIC FESTIVAL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Looe Music Festival is a not-for-profit, annual ticketed event. The charity?s aims are to promote and enhance the art of live music in Looe and to encourage citizenship through the delivery of an annual music festival in Looe, Cornwall. In delivering our charitable aims we endeavour to help regenerate our rural community by attracting a new generation of staying visitor to our rural community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2016
Total income:
£597,092
Donations and legacies | £1.56k | |
Charitable activities | £595.54k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£684,777
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £684.78k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £47,263 from government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £684.78k |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cornwall
Governance
- 04 June 2013: CIO registration
- 23 July 2013: Funds received from 1146140 LOOE MUSIC FESTIVAL
- 06 December 2019: Funds transferred to
- 06 December 2019: Removed (Removed by application)
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2014 | 30/11/2015 | 30/11/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £617.31k | £588.02k | £597.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £703.68k | £703.68k | £684.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | £47.26k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £0 | £1.56k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £534.94k | £588.02k | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £82.37k | £0 | £595.54k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £684.78k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £4.99k | £4.99k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 30/11/2014 | 30/11/2015 | 30/11/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £39.77k | £39.77k | £12.13k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £96.85k | £96.85k | £275.62k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2016 | 12 January 2018 | 104 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 November 2016
(These accounts |
11 January 2018 | 103 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 04 Jun 2013
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE,IMPROVE AND ADVANCE THE ARTS IN THE TOWN OF LOOE,CORNWALL AND IN PARTICULAR THE ART OF MUSIC BY THE ORGANISATION AND PRODUCTION OF COMMUNITY MUSIC FESTIVALS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window