Financial history WUKSART LIMITED

Charity Number: 1152138
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £40.45k £43.75k £43.75k £13.28k £17.15k
Total expenditure £41.85k £47.15k £47.15k £23.28k £22.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £31.70k £25.96k N/A N/A N/A