WUKSART LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Swiftwater and Flood Search and Rescue Capabilities throughout the UK for Domestic Emergency Services.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Derbyshire
- Leicestershire
- Lincolnshire
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 22 May 2013: Standard registration
- 09 January 2016: Removed (Does not operate)
- 08 February 2016: Re-registered
- 07 March 2016: Removed (Does not operate)
- 21 March 2016: Re-registered
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Laura Hughes | Trustee | 13 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Ellis | Trustee | 03 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jamie Shortland | Trustee | 25 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Aaron Parkin | Trustee | 25 March 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £77.91k | £40.45k | £43.75k | £43.75k | £13.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £77.91k | £41.85k | £47.15k | £47.15k | £23.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £61.20k | £31.70k | £25.96k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 02 September 2024 | 94 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 13 July 2023 | 43 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 13 July 2023 | 43 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 31 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 31 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 31 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 31 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 10 July 2020 | 40 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 10 July 2020 | 40 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 26 JUL 2012
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("OBJECTS") ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: (1) FOR PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO RELIEVE SUFFERING AND DISTRESS AMONGST PERSONS ENDANGERED BY FLOODING OR NATURAL HAZARDS BY THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A TRAINED RESCUE TEAM TO OPERATE PREDOMINANTLY THROUGHOUT THE EAST MIDLANDS AND THE UNITED KINGDOM OR TO OPERATE WORLDWIDE IF REQUESTED. (2) TO PROMOTE CO-OPERATION AND RELATIONSHIPS WITH OTHER SEARCH AND RESCUE TEAMS, POLICE FORCES, FIRE AUTHORITIES, AMBULANCE TRUSTS AND ANY OTHER INTERESTED PARTIES WITH SIMILAR OBJECTIVE TO THOSE OF THE CHARITY WITHIN THE OPERATIONAL AREA OF THE CHARITY. (3) TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC AT LARGE AND ALL POTENTIAL WATER USERS BY GIVING TALKS AND DEMONSTRATIONS OF THE POSSIBLE DANGERS AND HAZARDS OF WATER AND WATER SOURCES WITH THE AIM OF PREVENTING TRAGEDIES OR MISHAPS. (4) TO MAINTAIN AND IMPROVE THE PROFESSIONAL STANDARDS WITHIN THE CHARITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Watersafe UK Search and Rescue
Redhill Marina
Ratcliffe on sor
Nottingham
NG11 0EB
- Phone:
- 01773760518
- Email:
- info@wuksart.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window