TAS VALLEY CELL CHURCH
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Advancement of the Christian Gospel and Faith for the benefit of the public in accordance with the doctrine of the Church of England, including: prayer and worship, advancement of education in Christian faith and engagement in Christian discipleship, the building of community, care for those in need.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Norfolk
- Suffolk
Governance
- 25 June 2013: CIO registration
- 30 March 2023: Removed (Removed by application)
- 30 March 2023: Funds transferred to 249318 THE NORWICH DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE LIMITED
No other names
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.34k | £10.69k | £11.73k | £8.82k | £8.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.94k | £17.47k | £11.71k | £11.57k | £11.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 02 September 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 12 October 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 25 Jun 2013 as amended on 22 Apr 2021
Charitable objects
3.1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES AND TEACHINGS OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND WITHIN THE COUNTIES OF NORFOLK AND SUFFOLK 3.2 THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY WITHIN THE COUNTIES OF NORFOLK AND SUFFOLK 3.3 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION WITHIN THE COUNTIES OF NORFOLK AND SUFFOLK THROUGH THE PROVISION AND SUPPORT OF CHURCH OF ENGLAND VOLUNTARY AIDED, VOLUNTARY CONTROLLED AND ACADEMY SCHOOLS 3.4 THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED WITHIN THE COUNTIES OF NORFOLK AND SUFFOLK BECAUSE OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE.
Area of benefit
WITHIN THE COUNTIES OF NORFOLK AND SUFFOLK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window