EDUCATION MEDIA CENTRE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Education Media Centre improves the media/public awareness and understanding of education research and evidence.It makes it easy for the media to reach useful academic and research expertise on the education stories they are reporting.The Centre is independent and impartial in all its dealings, and has no political, ideological or research agenda or affiliation to any other organisation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 29 August 2013: CIO registration
- 08 December 2023: Removed (Removed by application)
- 08 December 2023: Funds transferred to 1158683 FULL FACT
- EMC (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £45.81k | £56.38k | £36.43k | £34.76k | £19.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £51.83k | £49.98k | £52.01k | £51.59k | £22.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 19 June 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 20 October 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 29 Aug 2013
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN EDUCATION POLICY, THEORY AND PRACTICE, PARTICULARLY BY THE DISSEMINATION OF ACADEMIC RESEARCH ABOUT EDUCATION VIA THE MEDIA.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window