WORK-WISE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Work-wise is an employer inspired and led initiative for science, technology, engineering, manufacturing and related sectors to support the development of young people so they have the knowledge, skills, aptitude and opportunities for employment within the Sheffield City Region
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
Total income includes £17,168 from 1 government contract(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
55 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Barnsley
- Derbyshire
- Doncaster
- Nottinghamshire
- Rotherham
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 31 January 2014: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR Chrsitopher Paul Hudson | Chair | 19 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
David John O'Hara | Trustee | 02 December 2016 |
|
|||||
Marie Cooper | Trustee | 02 December 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £122.00k | £98.46k | £199.24k | £282.46k | £194.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £114.41k | £96.63k | £184.47k | £245.37k | £223.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £38.99k | N/A | £17.17k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £42.74k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 09 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 09 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 03 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 03 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 19 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 19 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 20 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 20 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 21 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 21 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 30 APR 2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 27/01/2014
Charitable objects
TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE UP TO THE AGE OF 25, AND VULNERABLE ADULTS UP TO THE AGE OF 30, LIVING IN THE SHEFFIELD CITY REGION AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE AND ORGANISING PROGRAMMES FOR EDUCATION AND TRAINING AND OTHER ACTIVITIES AS A MEANS OF: (A) ADVANCING IN LIFE AND HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; (B) ADVANCING EDUCATION; (C)RELIEVING UNEMPLOYMENT; (D)PROVIDING RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITY IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR PEOPLE LIVING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO HAVE NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
White Rose Works
137 Carlisle Street
SHEFFIELD
S4 7LJ
- Phone:
- 01143498677
- Email:
- JOHN@WORK-WISE.CO.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window