ARAB INNOVATION NETWORK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE CHARITY WORKS TO ADVANCE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH DEVELOPING THE INNOVATION AND ENTREPRENEURIAL SKILLS OF STUDENTS, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN DEVELOPING COUNTRIES, IN THE ARAB REGION.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Cambridgeshire
- City Of Westminster
- Jordan
- United Arab Emirates
Governance
- 19 December 2013: CIO registration
- AIN (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GHADIR SIYAM | Chair | 27 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr Mohammed Atari | Trustee | 31 August 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr TARIQ SAEED | Trustee | 27 August 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.75k | £4.05k | £0 | £7.60k | £223 | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.18k | £4.04k | £0 | £97 | £3.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 19 Dec 2013
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH DEVELOPING THE INNOVATION AND SKILLS OF STUDENTS, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN DEVELOPING COUNTRIES, IN THE ARAB REGION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
51 Old Oaks View
BARNSLEY
South Yorkshire
S70 3RN
- Phone:
- 07872121505
- Email:
- info@arabinnovation.net
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window