THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ELLOUGHTON-CUM-BROUGH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular public worship open to all Provision of sacred space for personal prayer and contemplation Pastoral work, including visiting the sick and the bereaved Teaching of Christianity through sermons, courses and small groups Taking of religious assemblies in schools Promotion of Christianity through the staging of events, and toddler groups Supporting other charities in the UK and overseas
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
Total income includes £6,915 from 3 government grant(s)
People

13 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
Governance
- 17 June 2013: Previously excepted registration
- ELLOUGHTON-CUM-BROUGH PCC, EAST YORKSHIRE (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Rebecca Jane Allright | Chair | 16 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gillian May Bullock | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Robinson | Trustee | 12 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sally Louise Miller | Trustee | 12 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Derek Reynolds | Trustee | 27 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joann Randerson | Trustee | 27 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jean Towns | Trustee | 27 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Geoff Ogden | Trustee | 27 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lynne Hayton | Trustee | 27 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Angela Greaves | Trustee | 27 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Hartley Mitchell | Trustee | 27 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET DUNCUM | Trustee | 03 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
DIANE ELIZABETH MOFFATT | Trustee | 03 June 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £47.09k | £59.01k | £63.22k | £62.19k | £82.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £152.13k | £56.68k | £113.61k | £62.58k | £83.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £5.11k | £4.60k | N/A | £6.92k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 25 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 25 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 20 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 17 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 10 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Vicarage
55 Stockbridge Park
Elloughton
Brough
East Riding of Yorkshire
HU15 1JQ
- Phone:
- 01482667431
- Email:
- treasurerecb@outlook.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window