EUROPEAN SCHOOL OF ECONOMICS UNITED KINGDOM LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
IN LIQUIDATION
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
Governance
- 12 December 2013: Standard registration
- 11 July 2019: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- THE ESE (Working name)
- EUROPEAN SCHOOL OF ECONOMICS (INTERNATIONAL) LIMITED (Previous name)
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 01/12/1997 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 09/02/1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 07/05/2013 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 13/11/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04/12/2013
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO ADVANCING FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT EDUCATION IN THE FIELD OF ECONOMICS, FINANCE, MANAGEMENT, ENTERTAINMENT, MUSIC, POLITICS, SOCIAL STUDIES, CULTURE, LINGUISTICS, COMMUNICATION AND OTHER RELATED AREAS, INCLUDING BY THE ESTABLISHMENT AND OPERATION OF UNIVERSITIES, EDUCATIONAL COLLEGES AND ORGANISATIONS TO TEACH AND CARRY OUT RESEARCH IN ALL AREAS OF EDUCATION.
Area of benefit
LONDON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window