Financial history FISKERTON-CUM-MORTON VILLAGE HALL PLAYING FIELD AND PAVILLION

Charity Number: 503789
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £18.43k £31.46k £27.65k £13.44k £14.75k
Total expenditure £15.31k £29.55k £24.29k £21.31k £22.71k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £12.15k £17.34k £2.67k £1.79k