Financial history CHESHIRE WITHOUT ABUSE

Charity number: 1153273
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.37m £2.45m £2.22m £2.34m £2.38m
Total expenditure £1.26m £1.67m £2.01m £2.44m £2.65m
Income from government contracts £648.33k £754.33k £594.57k £655.67k £469.12k
Income from government grants £117.55k £674.30k £1.28m £1.18m £1.22m
Income - Donations and legacies £40.70k £39.61k £29.94k £44.77k £50.69k
Income - Other trading activities £21.81k £29.29k £55.08k £36.99k £68.40k
Income - Charitable activities £1.30m £2.35m £2.13m £2.26m £2.26m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £26.94k £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.25m £1.65m £2.01m £2.44m £2.65m
Expenditure - Raising funds £18.43k £15.56k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £17.90k £49.22k £31.44k £45.94k £37.79k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0