PEOPLE ACT FOR TUNISIA (PACT)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of education of the public in Tunisia and the relief of poverty in Tunisia.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Tunisia
Governance
- 05 August 2013: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Selma Feriani | Trustee | 31 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Fadhel Ben Atig | Trustee | 25 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
KHANSA GHARBI | Trustee | 22 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
ASMA BEN SALAH | Trustee | 22 May 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.66k | £11.61k | £11.16k | £6.00k | £3.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.19k | £10.80k | £7.93k | £10.07k | £2.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 12 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 13 October 2023 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 05 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 17 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 24 March 2021 | 175 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 16 NOV 2012
Charitable objects
4 THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("OBJECTS") ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN TUNISIA A)TO ADVANCE EDUCATION BY:- I)PROVISION OF SCHOOL MATERIALS AND EQUIPMENT II)REFURBISHMENT OF SCHOOLS AND LIBRARIES AND BUILDING LIBRARIES. III)TRAINING TEACHERS IV)PROVIDING TRANSPORT TO SCHOOL B)THE RELIEF OF POVERTY BY:- I) PROVISION OF FOOD,CLOTHING AND SHELTER. II)ASSISTING THE UNEMPLOYED BY GIVING ADVICE AND TRAINING III)PROVIDING ACCESS TO BASIC UTILITY SERVICES FOR HOMES IN DIFFICULT AREAS(EG. WATER, ELECTRICITY AND PHONE).
Area of benefit
TUNISA
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o SJ Males & Co
Basepoint Business Centre
110 Butterfield, Great Marlings
Luton
Bedfordshire
LU2 8DL
- Phone:
- 07595497325
- Email:
- INFO@PEOPLEACTFORTUNISIA.ORG
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window