Financial history ONGO COMMUNITIES LIMITED

Charity Number: 1156007
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.70m £1.82m £2.10m £1.91m £1.66m
Total expenditure £1.57m £1.61m £2.10m £1.79m £1.56m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £57.15k
Income from government grants £263.54k £244.92k £739.49k £390.51k £163.06k
Income - Donations and legacies £20.34k £41.84k £380 £109.73k £128.97k
Income - Other trading activities £117.36k £45.14k £58.87k £128.41k £141.74k
Income - Charitable activities £1.56m £1.73m £2.04m £1.67m £1.39m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.33m £1.42m £1.83m £1.52m £1.26m
Expenditure - Raising funds £240.19k £192.71k £266.81k £270.48k £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £1.73k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £51.00k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £299.50k