THE TERRAL MORGAN MEMORIAL FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We fund the installation of stair lifts, wheelchair ramps and other domestic aids for people diagnosed with cancer wishing to leave hospital. We work with all areas of the local NHS Trust. Promotional activities to inform local people of the funds purpose and work Trustees are conversant with the charity's aims and are confident with the process of reviewing applications.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 April 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
38 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Wirral
Governance
- 31 July 2013: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
AMANDA PATRICIA MORGAN BA | Chair | 19 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
David Cotgrave | Trustee | 26 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
Michael Burns BA | Trustee | 26 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
HELEN PATRICIA WASHINGTON NNEB | Trustee | 19 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
CAROL PATRICIA MCLACHLAN BA FCA | Trustee | 19 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
MATTHEW MICHAEL MAHER BA | Trustee | 19 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr KATHARINE ANNE MCKINNELL | Trustee | 19 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
MARILYN JOAN HUTCHINSON | Trustee | 19 June 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/04/2020 | 29/04/2021 | 29/04/2022 | 29/04/2023 | 29/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.18k | £1.20k | £4.39k | £9.81k | £11.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.07k | £11.23k | £11.62k | £5.26k | £3.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 April 2024 | 03 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 April 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 April 2022 | 06 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 April 2021 | 23 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 April 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 06 JUN 2013
Charitable objects
TO ASSIST IN THE CARE OF PERSONS IN WIRRAL DIAGNOSED WITH CANCER AND IN NEED OF EQUIPMENT AND DOMESTIC ADAPTATIONS NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE STATUARY AUTHORITIES OR SUBJECT TO A LENGTHY WAITING LIST.
Area of benefit
WIRRAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 5
Caroline Gardens
5-7 Caroline Place
Prenton
CH43 1TR
- Phone:
- 07908761913
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window