EAST MIDLANDS CHEERLEADING ACADEMY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide facilities for the recreation and leisure time for young people from the age of 2, in the interest of social welfare by the provision of training and performing in cheerleading activities so as to develop their physical and mental capacities that they may grow to full maturity as individuals and members of society and that their conditions of life may be improved
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Nottingham City
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 17 October 2013: Standard registration
- EMCA (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alison Gill | Trustee | 03 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Owain Davies | Trustee | 03 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robin Enderby | Trustee | 03 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Marie Trory | Trustee | 03 February 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £288.31k | £354.77k | £183.20k | £213.93k | £389.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £237.07k | £305.11k | £190.80k | £235.35k | £414.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £34.00k | £32.23k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 29 August 2024 | 60 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 29 August 2024 | 60 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 01 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 01 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 01 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 01 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 27 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 27 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 16 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 16 February 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 21/05/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 01/10/2013
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR THE RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME FOR YOUNG PEOPLE FROM THE AGE OF 2, IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE BY THE PROVISION OF TRAINING AND PERFORMING IN CHEERLEADING ACTIVITIES SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL AND MENTAL CAPACITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED
Contact information
- Address:
-
23 Handel Street
Nottingham
NG3 1JE
- Phone:
- 07930647032
- Email:
- emca@live.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window