GOUDHURST VILLAGE PRE-SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Goudhurst Village Pre-school provides education and care for 2 - 5 year olds in the locality of Goudhurst in Kent and beyond. It is Ofsted registered and follows the Early Years Foundation Stage curriculum.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 06 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Kent
Governance
- 12 June 2013: CIO registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Adrian Peter Smith | Trustee | 13 January 2025 |
|
|||||
John Arthur Charles McKenzie | Trustee | 13 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Leela Lamont | Trustee | 18 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Harriet Roberts Collins | Trustee | 18 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Araminta Meade | Trustee | 05 January 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 06/04/2020 | 06/04/2021 | 06/04/2022 | 06/04/2023 | 06/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £119.89k | £105.14k | £137.71k | £136.92k | £147.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £124.06k | £113.01k | £131.58k | £129.95k | £145.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £6.64k | £2.21k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 06 April 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 06 April 2023 | 27 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2023 | 27 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 06 April 2022 | 17 February 2023 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2022 | 17 February 2023 | 11 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 06 April 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 06 April 2020 | 06 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2020 | 06 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 12 Jun 2013
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS ATTENDING GOUDHURST VILLAGE PRE-SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
GOUDHURST
Contact information
- Address:
-
Gullivers
North Road
Goudhurst
CRANBROOK
Kent
TN17 1JH
- Phone:
- 07766553728
- Email:
- alistairgvp@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window