Financial history FURNESS MENTAL HEALTH TRUST

Charity number: 1152986
Charity reporting is overdue by 461 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £1.90k £863 £24.89k £39.49k £24.02k
Total expenditure £31.57k £30.22k £23.42k £25.64k £22.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £16.64k £1.01k