Trustees THE STEVE CHARLES HELP A FRIEND FUND

Charity number: 1153168
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Joshua Wright Chair 16 January 2017
None on record
Martin Ansell Trustee 31 August 2022
None on record
Sue Watson Trustee 31 August 2022
None on record
Michael Hutchings Trustee 31 August 2022
None on record
Toots Ansell Trustee 01 July 2020
None on record
Theresa Critchell Trustee 02 December 2019
None on record
Scott Critchell Trustee 19 June 2017
None on record