Accounts and annual returns EVA ORGANIZATION FOR WOMEN (EOW)

Charity number: 1156347
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 18 February 2025 18 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 29 November 2024 303 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 11 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 21 March 2022 49 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 16 February 2021 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required