SAMEERA FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1154228
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

GRANT MAKING - to poor and orphan school children of Pakistan, Commonwealth and Developing Countries - Disability appliances for people with physical disabilities - Grants for purchase of medicines - Food packets for widows or financially disadvantaged families - Fresh meals for homeless and vulnerable in Swansea - Training courses for visually impaired -

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 August 2023

Total income: £125,900
Total expenditure: £115,937

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
  • Economic/community Development/employment
  • Recreation
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • City Of Swansea
  • Throughout England
  • Bangladesh
  • Brazil
  • Cameroon
  • Congo (Democratic Republic)
  • Egypt
  • Kenya
  • Libya
  • Madagascar
  • Morocco
  • Nepal
  • Occupied Palestinian Territories
  • Pakistan
  • Uganda
  • Yemen

Governance

Registration history:
  • 17 October 2013: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • SAFFOSS (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr SHAHZAD ATHER Chair 20 July 2018
WELSH ISLAMIC CULTURAL ASSOCIATION SWANSEA
Received: On time
Wasim Malik Trustee 24 February 2022
None on record
Dr Shaheen Uqaily Trustee 24 February 2022
None on record
Dr RADWAN ABDO KAID ABDULLA Trustee 20 July 2018
None on record
Dr SYED FAROOQ ABBAS SHAH Trustee 20 July 2018
None on record
ZAEEM RANA Trustee 07 February 2018
None on record
DR RASHEED AHMAD MALIK Trustee 14 June 2013
None on record
MOHSEN ABDELGHANI ELNADI ELBELTAGI Trustee 14 June 2013
EUROPEAN INSTITUTE OF HUMAN SCIENCES
Received: On time
DR MAHABOOB BASHA Trustee 14 June 2013
WELSH ISLAMIC CULTURAL ASSOCIATION SWANSEA
Received: On time
Age Cymru West Glamorgan Limited
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/08/2019 30/08/2020 30/08/2021 30/08/2022 30/08/2023
Total gross income £51.65k £94.39k £100.70k £123.69k £125.90k
Total expenditure £39.89k £64.27k £86.18k £121.28k £115.94k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 August 2023 08 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 August 2023 10 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 August 2022 19 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 August 2022 19 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 August 2021 09 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 August 2021 09 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 August 2020 17 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 August 2020 17 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 August 2019 01 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 August 2019 01 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
20 Bernard Street
Uplands
SWANSEA
SA2 0HU
Phone:
07775500780