Ebenezer Baptist Chapel

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Church's aims are to spread the gospel of the Lord Jesus Christ and to edify the congregation through the preaching and teaching of the Word of God, the circulation of good Christian literature, and the support of missionary endeavour at home and abroad.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Dudley
- Sandwell
Governance
- 28 May 2013: Standard registration
- EBENEZER BAPTIST CHAPEL (OLD HILL) CRADLEY HEATH (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Benjamin Paul Sheldon | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|||||||
Andrew James Martin | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Thomas James Hayward | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|||||||
JOHN STEPHEN SMITH | Trustee | 23 May 2013 |
|
|
||||||
PAUL ERNEST HICKMAN | Trustee | 23 May 2013 |
|
|||||||
PAUL SIMEON STONELAKE | Trustee | 23 May 2013 |
|
|||||||
MARCUS JAMES MARTIN | Trustee | 23 May 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £89.65k | £69.47k | £73.41k | £79.44k | £81.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £87.76k | £76.03k | £77.61k | £108.97k | £104.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 17 August 2024 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 17 August 2024 | 18 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 22 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 22 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 09 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 09 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 12 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 12 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 13 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 13 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 APR 2013 as amended on 16 Jan 2019
Charitable objects
THE PRINCIPAL OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH ACCORDING TO BAPTIST PRINCIPLES AND IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE BASIS OF FAITH AS STATED IN SCHEDULE 1. THE CHARITY MAY ALSO CARRY OUT OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND/OR OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ebenezer Baptist Chapel
Station Road
CRADLEY HEATH
B64 6PA
- Phone:
- 07458302983
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window