Trustees TY CERDD - MUSIC CENTRE WALES
Charity number: 1152853
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steph Power | Chair | 24 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Gareth Francis Churchill | Trustee | 23 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Claire Louise Foster | Trustee | 07 December 2022 |
|
|||||
Litang Shao | Trustee | 07 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Giselle Heloise Dugdale | Trustee | 21 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Niamh O'Donnell | Trustee | 21 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christina Macaulay | Trustee | 22 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Klaudia Angelika Zawadka | Trustee | 22 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Kathleen Ford-Evans | Trustee | 17 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tumi Williams | Trustee | 11 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Harriet Elizabeth Wybor | Trustee | 15 October 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.