YOUNG PEOPLE COUNT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A safe space for young people aged 11 - 18 in Pocklington, YPC is open Tuesday to Friday, 4pm - 8 pm. We respond to their needs with advice, training, and fun activities, promoting positive outcomes and helping them reach their potential. From crafts and cooking to sports, IT skills, and access to counselling, we offer a welcoming environment where young people can learn, grow, and thrive.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £16,372 from 5 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
Governance
- 24 July 2013: CIO registration
- 19 February 2025: Funds received from 1100571 THE GIAN FOUNDATION
- NOT APPLICABLE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gerard Wareham | Chair | 29 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Trevor Brian Collinson | Trustee | 16 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Hawkins | Trustee | 16 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Durose-Croft | Trustee | 22 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Claire Jarvis | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Alexander Jarvis | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Roland Middleton Cronshaw | Trustee | 28 March 2023 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.06k | £12.49k | £94.25k | £31.85k | £75.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.05k | £11.31k | £77.34k | £63.03k | £63.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £32.48k | £15.08k | £16.37k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 03 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 03 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 12 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 12 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 23 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 23 January 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 24 Jul 2013
Charitable objects
TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE AGED 11 TO 18 LIVING IN POCKLINGTON BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE AND ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF PHYSICAL, EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER ACTIVITIES AS A MEANS OF: (A) ADVANCING IN LIFE AND HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; (B) ADVANCING EDUCATION; (C) RELIEVING UNEMPLOYMENT; (D) PROVIDING RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITY IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR PEOPLE LIVING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO HAVE NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Young People Count
17 Railway Street
Pocklington
YORK
YO42 2QR
- Phone:
- 02078462370
- Email:
- office@ypcount.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window