THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF GOLDSWORTH PARK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
REGULAR PUBLIC WORSHIP, PASTORAL WORK INCLUDING VISITING SICK AND BEREAVED, TEACHING OF CHRISTIANITY, TAKING RELIGIOUS ASSEMBLIES IN SCHOOLS, PROVISION OF YOUTH CLUB WITH CHRISTIAN ETHOS, PROMOTION OF CHRISTIANITY THROUGH EVENTS AND DISTRIBUTION OF LITERATURE, PROMOTING THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH FOR SENIOR CITIZENS, CHILDREN, PARENTS AND TODDLERS, SUPPORTING OTHER CHARITIES.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

18 Trustee(s)
165 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Kenya
Governance
- 26 July 2013: Standard registration
- GOLDSWORTH PARK PCC (Working name)
- GOLDSWORTH PARK PCC (Previous name)
- THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF GOLDSWORTH PARK (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Scott Anthony Smith | Chair | 16 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Mimms | Trustee | 18 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Dawn Ariane Lambart | Trustee | 26 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sheryl Yvonne Herbert | Trustee | 26 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Helen Waters | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ricardo Estee-Wale | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Andrew Mervyn Humphries | Trustee | 16 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Andrew Smith | Trustee | 16 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Louise Butler | Trustee | 16 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lynne Ann West | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Barbara June Humphries | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Gregory Karl Mimms | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alison Jane Sanderson | Trustee | 19 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
JANICE VICKERS | Trustee | 18 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
NEIL DAVID CHEETHAM | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT NEIL RATTEE | Trustee | 24 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
SHANI LARAINE ORCHARD | Trustee | 12 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
JOHN BRADLEY RAYNER | Trustee | 27 April 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £265.58k | £240.81k | £235.92k | £294.90k | £275.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £245.51k | £269.01k | £277.11k | £322.29k | £277.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £6.00k | £2.50k | £11.68k | £4.58k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 11 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 20 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 18 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 18 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02/01/1957
Charitable objects
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE(1956)AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES. PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Windyridge
Scotts Grove Road
Chobham
WOKING
GU24 8DX
- Phone:
- 01483 723879
- Email:
- office@standrewsgwp.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window