Financial history COLEG SIR GAR

Charity number: 1152522
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £35.49m £40.45m £46.64m £46.65m £46.14m
Total expenditure £36.76m £39.96m £45.52m £47.08m £45.41m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £23.74m £24.59m £34.01m £34.51m £35.08m
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £35.45m £40.44m £46.61m £46.18m £45.38m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £27.00k £5.00k £34.00k £468.00k £754.00k
Income - Other £11.00k £4.00k £1.00k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £36.76m £39.96m £45.52m £47.08m £45.41m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £59.00k £58.00k £62.00k £65.00k £67.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0