Accounts and annual returns CHILDREN'S WELL-WISHERS NETWORK (CWN)

Charity Number: 1154410
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 04 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2023 06 June 2024 67 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2022 23 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2021 25 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2020 17 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required